Baker, Terry Ann (CPSO#: 85128)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 13 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007