Bakhsh, Hanadi Adnan M (CPSO#: 87740)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2007 to 14 Oct 2007
PEAP - Resident - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Oct 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007