Bakhsh, Safwan Adel Abdel Rahman (CPSO#: 102763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Medical Oncology
McMaster university
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 3879495
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAFWAN ADEL ABDEL RAHMAN BAKHSH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAKHSH is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BAKHSH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAKHSH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BAKHSH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAKHSH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAKHSH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018