Bakht, Muhammod Murad (CPSO#: 62926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:Dacca Medical College, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50619
Fax: (905) 494-6451
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bakht Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bakht ( CPSO# 62926 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMOD MURAD BAKHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKHT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 01 Feb 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1999