Bakker, Dorothy Jane (CPSO#: 62695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: Emslie, Dorothy Jane (used until: 27 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
University of Guelph
J T Powell Building
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 836-7431
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTHY JANE BAKKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1991