Bakshi, Nupura Krishnadev (CPSO#: 81025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Krishnadev, Nupura (used until: )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute Mississauga
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute - Brampton
7700 Hurontario Street, Suite 605
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 459-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

St Michael's Health Ctr Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Eye Clinic
600 University Avenue
Suite 411, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5151
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nupura K. Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bakshi ( CPSO# 81025 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
600 University Avenue
Suite 411
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
St Michael's Health Ctr Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7422

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute Brampton
605 - 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute Mississauga
1 - 3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NUPURA KRISHNADEV BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011

Concerns

Source: FSMB
Active Date: March 27, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On February 20, 2018, the Maryland State Board of Physicians, with the agreement of Dr. Nupura Krishnadev (Bakshi), made a Consent Order finding that Dr. Krishnadev had not obtained all of the continuing medical education credits required under Maryland law contrary to the affirmation she signed in her renewal application that she had completed them. The Consent Order ordered Dr. Krishnadev to pay a fine of U.S.$900 and to obtain all of the required and outstanding education credits. The Maryland State Board of Physicians filed another Order on March 27, 2018 stating that the terms and conditions of the Consent Order had been satisfied. The College was notified of this finding by a report on April 10, 2018. ¬¬