Bal Haj, Ghazala Belal Saeed (CPSO#: 80644)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2004 to 09 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 10 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006