Bal, Sharon Kular (CPSO#: 77947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 201
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 620-4533
Fax: (519) 620-1767
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Bal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bal ( CPSO# 77947 )

Business Address:
201 - 614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3E8
Phone Number: (519) 620-4533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON KULAR BAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004