Bala, Vinchala Morzaria (CPSO#: 94779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCHALA MORZARIA BALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Feb 2011 to 02 May 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2011 to 07 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Feb 2012 to 07 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2014