Balachandra, Vasthare Krishnamurthy (CPSO#: 23929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Mysore University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ambulatory Care
Blue Water Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 336-4615
Fax: (519) 542-1632
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VASTHARE KRISHNAMURTHY BALACHANDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALACHANDRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1971