Balagangatharan, Arppana (CPSO#: 108284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  24 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Windsor University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wardenwood Health Centre
3319 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2K 1G4
Phone: 6473448488
Fax: 6473522272
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wardenwood Health Centre
2361 Warden Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1T 1V7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2015 to 20 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Arppana Balagangatharan may practise family medicine with Wardenwood
                  Health   Centre,   in  Scarborough  and  Toronto,  Ontario,  while  under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Balagangatharan's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not
                        provide the required  reports  to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Balagangatharan's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment  report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Balagangatharan's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 25,  2016,  and  will expire on or
                  before May 24, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.