Balakrishnan, Pradeep (CPSO#: 61370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Mysore University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Homewood Health Centre 150 Delhi Street Guelph, ON N1E 6K9
Date Received: 13 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2014