Balasubramaniam, Anandh (CPSO#: 84083)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Madras, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2006 to 25 Apr 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006