Balderson, Kenneth Earle (CPSO#: 62310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Balderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Balderson ( CPSO# 62310 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
17-040 - C C W
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3082

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH EARLE BALDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991