Baldock, Jane Susan (CPSO#: 56461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Adult Mental health
752 Kings Street West,
Postal Bag 603
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 544-4900 Ext. 53124
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane S Baldock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Baldock ( CPSO# 56461 )

Business Address:
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5A2
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Business Address:
111 Rideau Street
Kingston ON  K7K 7B2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE SUSAN BALDOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986