Baldwin, Clark Vincent (CPSO#: 71442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Waterloo
Health Services
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4990
Fax: (519) 888-4306
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baldwin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 13 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARK VINCENT BALDWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALDWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2002