Balec, Raymond John (CPSO#: 88476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NorWest Community Health Centre
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3J6
Phone: (807) 622-8235
Fax: (807) 622-3548
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND JOHN BALEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALEC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010