Balfe, John Williamson (CPSO#: 22541)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Feb 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010