Balhaj, Thuraya Belal Saeed (CPSO#: 108108)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 17 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2017