Bali, Ambika (CPSO#: 53365)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994