Bali, Kamal (CPSO#: 101847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y4E9
Phone: (613) 798 5555 Ext. 10605
Fax: 6137614898
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL BALI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BALI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BALI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BALI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BALI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BALI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BALI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018