Bali, Neena (CPSO#: 42500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: Daya, Neena (used until: 14 Jan 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6615
Fax: (613) 798-2988
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bali ( CPSO# 42500 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEENA BALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1992