Balian, Harout Raffis (CPSO#: 57329)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Armenian, English, French, Russian

Education:Erevan Medical Institute, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1997