Balit, Corrine Rita (CPSO#: 96394)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2016