Balkhair, Taiba Mohammed Abdullah (CPSO#: 82728)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2005 to 11 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 06 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Oct 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2008