Balkissoon, Eric Jagdeo (CPSO#: 31434)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Madras, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016