Ball, Adrianne Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 67940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 May 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 300 3
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 1
Fax: (905) 845-3996
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANNE MARGARET MARY BALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2003