Ball, Daniel Glen (CPSO#: 21979)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel G. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ball ( CPSO# 21979 )

Business Address:
Algonquin X-Ray & Ultrasound
104 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 476-6228

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-7525

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre 50 College Drive North Bay P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2017