Ballagh, Robert Hamilton (CPSO#: 59480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-6966
Fax: (705) 725-7330
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Ballagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ballagh ( CPSO# 59480 )

Business Address:
402 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-6966

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HAMILTON BALLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLAGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989