Ballantyne, Robert Harry (CPSO#: 22866)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Ballantyne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 530 Columbia Street West Waterloo, ON N2T 0B1; and New Vision Family Health Team 421 Greenbrook Drive Kitchener, ON N2M 4K1
Instructions: Medical records at the New Vision Family Health Team are in possession of Dr. O'Brien
Date Received: 23 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014