Ballingall, David Low Kyle (CPSO#: 25314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
155 Clarke Rd
London
London ON  N5W 5C9
Phone: (519) 455-1100
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID LOW KYLE BALLINGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLINGALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1972