Ballon, Bruce Conrad (CPSO#: 66452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
& Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 4466
Fax: (416) 595-6399
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

77 City Centre Dr #604
Mississauga L5B 1M5
Afghanistan
Afghanistan
Phone: (289) 207-0011
County: 
Electoral District: 

77 City Centre Dr #604
Mississauga L5B 1M5
Afghanistan
Afghanistan
Phone: (289) 207-0011
County: 
Electoral District: 

77 City Centre Dr #604
Mississauga ON  L5B 1M5
Canada
Phone: (289) 207-0011
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ballon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ballon ( CPSO# 66452 )

Business Address:
10 Jainey Place
North York ON  M5M 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 484-9655

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE CONRAD BALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998