Balmaceda, Rufino Bringas (CPSO#: 42436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Ilocano, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Center
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6365
Fax: (613) 798-2992
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Lawrence Valley Correctional &
Treatment Centre-Secure Treatment U
1804 Highway 2 East
PO Box 1050
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 341-2870 Ext. 1328
Fax: (613) 341-2882
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balmaceda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Balmaceda ( CPSO# 42436 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
1804 Highway #2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 7N2
Phone Number: (613) 341-2870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUFINO BRINGAS BALMACEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALMACEDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1992