Balogh, Alexander George (CPSO#: 66670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Tom Baker Cancer Center
1331 29th Street Northwest
Calgary AB  T2N 4N2
Phone: (403) 521-3077 Ext. 3091
Fax: (403) 283-1651

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER GEORGE BALOGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALOGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 May 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1998