Balogh, Judit Maria (CPSO#: 50113)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Balogh, Judith Maria (used until: 02 Oct 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: T2-152 OCC, Sunnybrook Hospital, 2075 Bayview Avenue, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015