Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Balon, Jeffrey William (CPSO#: 67612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1538 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville ON  K2S 1B1
Phone: (613) 836-1711
Fax: (613) 836-1712
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite B22
550 Terminal Ave
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Canada
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Balon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Balon ( CPSO# 67612 )

Business Address:
1538 Stittsville Main Street
Stittsville ON  K2S 1B1
Phone Number: (613) 836-1711

Business Address:
B22 - 550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-4770

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM BALON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1993