Balsys, Aras Jonas (CPSO#: 24016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D2
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone: (416) 244-5565
Fax: (416) 244-1004
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medflex Family Practice Clinic
Unit 6
25 Woodstream Boulevard
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7Y8
Canada
Phone: 905 265 0717
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Ontario Cardiac Centre
Unit B4
4779 Steeles Ave East
Toronto ON  M1V 4S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 298-4956
Fax: (416) 754-9543
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

suite 210
2330 kennedy rd
scarborough
on
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Canada
Phone: 416-335-1717
Fax: 416-335-1719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aras Balsys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Balsys ( CPSO# 24016 )

Business Address:
Unit D2
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone Number: (416) 244-5565

Business Address:
Suite 210
2330 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 335-1717

Business Address:
Suite B4
4779 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1V 4S5
Phone Number: (416) 298-4956

Business Address:
Suite 6
25 Woodstream Boulevard
Vaughan ON  L4L 7Y8
Phone Number: (905) 265-0717

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 13 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 13, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Aras Jonas Balsys, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Balsys has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Balsys has agreed to restrict his office-based practice at all of his
                  Practice Locations, including any Walk-In Clinic where he may work, to
                  routine, non-urgent, non-emergent consultations within his scope of
                  practice as a general internist, which includes respirology. If a patient
                  requires a procedure outside of his scope of practice, he shall make the
                  appropriate referral.
                  
                  Dr. Balsys has agreed to restrict his practice to patients who have been
                  referred to him for consultation by another physician or nurse
                  practitioner who has assessed the patient prior to requesting the
                  consult, and to follow-up as necessary. Dr. Balsys may not attend on
                  patients without such referral.
                  
                  Dr. Balsys does not have privileges at any hospital in Ontario or in any
                  other jurisdiction, with the exception of courtesy privileges at Humber
                  River Regional Hospital limited to pulmonary function testing. Dr. Balsys
                  has agreed not to seek hospital privileges in Ontario or in any other
                  jurisdiction.