Bami, Harmeet Kaur (CPSO#: 67404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Suite 1423
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6695
Fax: (905) 494-6710
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peel memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 416 494 2120
Fax: 905 494 6710
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bami ( CPSO# 67404 )

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
1423 - 2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6695

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARMEET KAUR BAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 12 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1997