Bami, Karan (CPSO#: 103345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room 407A
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1S8
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARAN BAMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAMI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BAMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BAMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018