Bancej, Sonja Desiree (CPSO#: 56621)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: McKenzie Health Centre 10 Trench Street Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 4Z3
Date Received: 03 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 21 Sep 1989 to 13 Dec 1989
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013