Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bandey, Karl Jason (CPSO#: 60919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
444 Douro Sreet, Suite 201
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 271-7172
Fax: (519) 271-3124
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Bandey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bandey ( CPSO# 60919 )

Business Address:
201 - 444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N0E 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 271-1731

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARL JASON BANDEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANDEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990