Bandiera, Glen William (CPSO#: 66561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 1-008E
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5976
Fax: (416) 864-5341
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN WILLIAM BANDIERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANDIERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998