Bandukwala, Farah (CPSO#: 93704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
.
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

W181 West Kerr Hall
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 3P6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farah Bandukwala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bandukwala ( CPSO# 93704 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Business Address:
W181 West Kerr Hall
350 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARAH BANDUKWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANDUKWALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012