Bane, Anita Lorraine (CPSO#: 76954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone: 519-621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Bane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bane ( CPSO# 76954 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Anita Lorraine Bane may practise medicine independently in Pathology.