Banemai, Mohammed Othman Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 70736)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000