Banerjee, Diponkar (CPSO#: 31020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Anatomical Pathology
Box 117
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79080
Fax: (613) 737-8461
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diponkar Banerjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIPONKAR BANERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1979