Banerji, Anna (CPSO#: 61211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Pediatric Consultation Clinic
30 The Queensway
3rd Floor OLM Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6625
Fax: 416-530-6294
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

COSTI Pediatric Refugee Clinic
100 Lippincott Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2P1
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-8319
Fax: 416-922-6668
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Faculty Lead, Indigenous & Refugee
Post MD Education
Faculty of Medicine, U of T
6th Floor, 500 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-8319
Fax: (416) 978-7144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Tropical Disease Unit
Norman Urquhart Building - 13th Fl
UHN, Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 3675
Fax: 416 340 3260
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA BANERJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANERJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003