Banihashemi, Sayed-Behnam (CPSO#: 86234)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone: (613) 722-8086
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Banihashemi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Banihashemi ( CPSO# 86234 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
201 - 1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 722-8086

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAYED-BEHNAM BANIHASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANIHASHEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011