Banjo, Olufemi (CPSO#: 104800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Banjo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Banjo ( CPSO# 104800)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (226) 750-5355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Olufemi  Banjo  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  psychiatry and
            geriatric psychiatry, only.