Bankar, Aniket Rajiv (CPSO#: 113824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 30 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Haematology
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 2230
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIKET RAJIV BANKAR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BANKAR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BANKAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BANKAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BANKAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BANKAR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BANKAR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 29 Oct 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 30 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019